RI H7770 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exclude any "prevailing wage" benefits from the workers' wage base used to calculate workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7770.pdf |