RI H7768 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Congressional Delegation To Support House Resolution 54 Of The 2023-2024 Congress To Amend The United States Constitution To Prove That The Rights Protected And Extended By The Constitution Are The Rights Of Natural Persons Only
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION RESPECTFULLY REQUESTING THE RHODE ISLAND CONGRESSIONAL DELEGATION TO SUPPORT HOUSE RESOLUTION 54 OF THE 2023-2024 CONGRESS TO AMEND THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO PROVE THAT THE RIGHTS PROTECTED AND EXTENDED BY THE CONSTITUTION ARE THE RIGHTS OF NATURAL PERSONS ONLY
Sponsors
Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-22 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/26/2024) |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7768.pdf |