RI H7768 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the "honorably discharged veteran of the United States Armed Forces" from the veterans' home administrator requirement and would require licensure of such individual through the licensing of nursing home administrators statute.
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7768.pdf |