RI H7762 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the penalty for violating any state law regulating the illicit sale of cigarettes.
Title
Cigarette Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-06-04 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2014) |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |