RI H7760 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting Immediate Safety Improvements To The Claiborne Pell Bridge In Honor Of The Memory Of Kathy Meunier, Kenny Prior, And Elijah Swift
Title
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting Immediate Safety Improvements To The Claiborne Pell Bridge In Honor Of The Memory Of Kathy Meunier, Kenny Prior, And Elijah Swift
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |