RI H7757 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows parents or guardians sufficient access to observe their child's special education program in order to assess the child's performance in a current program.
Title
Children With Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7757.pdf |