RI H7752 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Updates and clarifies various insurance statutes.
Title
Surplus Lines Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub B (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub B (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2022-03-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-03-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |