RI H7751 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a purchaser of a catalytic converter to obtain a copy of the registration for the vehicle from which the catalytic converter was removed with exceptions.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals -- Catalytic Converters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-05-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2022) |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-16 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |