RI H7742 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the building commissioner to submit a financial impact report of any proposed process or formula and options for establishing statewide permit fees to the general assembly by January 1, 2017, with implementation on July 1, 2017.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2016) |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |