RI H7741 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the "building height" definition in chapter 24 of title 45 (zoning ordinances) for property in special flood hazard areas. The building height would be measured from the base flood elevation. Effective March 1, 2019.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Senate voted to reconsider |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2018-05-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |