RI H7733 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the period of time that the DHS provides childcare to families with income below 180% of the federal poverty level under the RI works program by 6 months to June 30, 2015.
Title
The Rhode Island Works Program
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | House passed as amended |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |