RI H7727 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- FAIRNESS IN WOMEN'S SPORTS ACT - Categorizes women by their biological identity at birth rather than their gender identity for purpose of organized sports.
Title
Categorizes women by their biological identity at birth rather than their gender identity for purpose of organized sports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-04-01 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7727.pdf |