RI H7719 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the dollar amount of public works projects that shall be awarded to minority business entities to a minimum of twenty-five percent (25%) of the dollar value of the project.
Title
Minority Business Enterprise
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7719.pdf |