RI H7714 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers -- Renewable Energy Standard (would Diversify The State's Energy Generation Sources By Increasing Maximum Allowable Distributed Generation Capacities And Would Provide For Public/private Partnerships And Multi-municipal Nonprofit Energy Consortiums)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers -- Renewable Energy Standard (would Diversify The State's Energy Generation Sources By Increasing Maximum Allowable Distributed Generation Capacities And Would Provide For Public/private Partnerships And Multi-municipal Nonprofit Energy Consortiums)
Sponsors
Rep. David Caprio [D] | Rep. David Caprio [D] | Rep. Christopher Fierro [D] | Rep. Douglas Gablinske [D] |
Rep. Rice [?] | Rep. Amy Rice [D] | Rep. David Segal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture | |
2010-06-10 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-06-08 | Committee continued | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-27 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7714.pdf |