RI H7704 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants immunity to any person engaged in or witnessing commercial sexual activity if they report the offense to law enforcement and in good faith assist or attempt to assist in the investigation of offense, even if they later withdraw their cooperation.
Title
Commercial Sexual Activity
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7704.pdf |