RI H7683 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- REAL ESTATE CONVEYANCE TAX - Imposes a conveyance tax on purchasers, of single-family residential properties, who are for- profit entities with over $15,000,000 in assets, at a rate of $6.90/$500, to be collected for housing production fund established in § 42-128-2.1.
Title
Imposes a conveyance tax on purchasers, of single-family residential properties, who are for- profit entities with over $15,000,000 in assets, at a rate of $6.90/$500, to be collected for housing production fund established in § 42-128-2.1.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. David Place [R] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7683.pdf |