RI H7668 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Cooperative Service Among School Districts (would Define The Mission Of The Educational Collaboratives In This State.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Cooperative Service Among School Districts (would Define The Mission Of The Educational Collaboratives In This State.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-01 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-11 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-31 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7668.pdf |