RI H7662 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- REGISTRATION OF VOTERS - Allows non-affiliated party voters to vote in party primaries, without becoming an affiliated party voter.
Title
Allows non-affiliated party voters to vote in party primaries, without becoming an affiliated party voter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | House read and passed |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/23/2024) |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |