RI H7661 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that teachers be certified in first aid, cardiopulmonary resuscitation and automated external defibrillator (AED) use prior to teacher certification, with exceptions for the disabled and those employed in a school which lacks AED device.
Title
Certification Of Teachers
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016) |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7661.pdf |