RI H7660 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of education to incorporate financial literacy education in the high school education program.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016) |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/09/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7660.pdf |