RI H7647 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Requires landlords to list all mandatory fees when advertising any residential property for rent as well as on the first page of any lease. Prohibits a landlord from charging a convenience fee when the tenant pays rent.
Title
Requires landlords to list all mandatory fees when advertising any residential property for rent as well as on the first page of any lease. Prohibits a landlord from charging a convenience fee when the tenant pays rent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7647.pdf |