RI H7646 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a retired teacher with 4% COLA increase for 10 years, reduced by every COLA year received, on the first $60,000 of retirement allowance. After totaling 10 years of adjustments, the annual increase shall be reduced to 3% until death.
Title
Retirement System -- Contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7646.pdf |