RI H7633 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continues all provisions of firefighter's collective bargaining agreements until a successor agreement has been reached or an interest arbitration award has been rendered.
Title
Firefighters' Arbitration
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7633.pdf |