RI H7632 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that every city and town must maintain a municipal veterans' service officer. Would also authorize a $100,000 appropriation to be used for support and outreach for veterans.
Title
Veterans' Affairs
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7632.pdf |