RI H7631 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the awarding of disfigurement workers' compensation benefits to scarring of the neck, face, and hands and prohibits them from being awarded less than one year from the date of the disfiguring event.
Title
Workers' Compensation Benefits - Disfigurement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2016) |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7631.pdf |