RI H7629 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- INDICTMENTS, INFORMATIONS AND COMPLAINTS - Includes the offense of second-degree sexual assault among the offenses to which there shall be no statute of limitations and provides for a ten (10) year statute of limitations for third-degree sexual assault.
Title
Includes the offense of second-degree sexual assault among the offenses to which there shall be no statute of limitations and provides for a ten (10) year statute of limitations for third-degree sexual assault.
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7629.pdf |