RI H7628 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public utilities regulated by the PUC to file a rate request for a decrease in their base rates to reflect any federal tax savings as a result of the enactment of federal tax legislation commencing May 1, 2019, and every May 1 thereafter.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018) |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7628.pdf |