RI H7626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- THE PRACTICE OF ACUPUNCTURE AND CHINESE MEDICINE - Broadens the definition of a "qualified individual" in acupuncture and Chinese medicine to include any person trained and certified in auricular acudetox.
Title
Broadens the definition of a "qualified individual" in acupuncture and Chinese medicine to include any person trained and certified in auricular acudetox.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Businesses And Professions
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- THE PRACTICE OF ACUPUNCTURE AND CHINESE MEDICINE
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- THE PRACTICE OF ACUPUNCTURE AND CHINESE MEDICINE
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7626.pdf |