RI H7615 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Study Student Transportation Needs And System Costs (creates A 13-member Joint Commission To Study The Transportation Needs Of Students And Recommend What Changes Are Necessary, And Who Would Report Back To The General Assembly By April 16, 2025, And Expire On May 27, 2025.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL JOINT LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY STUDENT TRANSPORTATION NEEDS AND SYSTEM COSTS (Creates a 13-member joint commission to study the transportation needs of students and recommend what changes are necessary, and who would report back to the General Assembly by April 16, 2025, and expire on May 27, 2025.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2024) |
2024-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-31 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2024) |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |