RI H7613 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows William Francis O'Brien to join Heidi Elizabeth Regan and Christopher Joseph Leo O'Brien in marriage on or about July 24, 2020, within the Town of Portsmouth, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/13/2020) |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | House | House read and passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |