RI H7595 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the distribution of food products containing the drug kratom, a drug of concern for its stimulant and sedative effects, to consumers by the department of health.
Title
Kratom Consumer Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |