RI H7595 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-19 - Meeting postponed (05/23/2018)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-19 - Meeting postponed (05/23/2018)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes compliance/certification procedure for criminal pre-trial discovery/creates a 9 member task force to investigate/make recommendations, pre-trial discovery with report due 1/1/20 and dissolution on 1/1/22.
Title
Trial
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | House | Meeting postponed (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7595.pdf |