RI H7587 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Strongly Supporting A National Infrastructure Bank Through The Passage Of The 118th Congress H.r. 4052
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION STRONGLY SUPPORTING A NATIONAL INFRASTRUCTURE BANK THROUGH THE PASSAGE OF THE 118TH CONGRESS H.R. 4052
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7587.pdf |