RI H7544 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the computation formula relative to temporary disability insurance and adds siblings and caregivers to those workers eligible to receive temporary caregiver insurance.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2018) |
2018-03-05 | House | Committee transferred to House Labor |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7544.pdf |