RI H7542 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-07 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Assess The Educational Needs Of Children With Reading Disabilities And Dyslexia
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Assess The Educational Needs Of Children With Reading Disabilities And Dyslexia
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Baldelli-Hunt [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-06 | House passed Sub B in concurrence | |
2012-05-30 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-30 | Senate passed Sub B | |
2012-05-29 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/30/2012) | |
2012-05-23 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2012-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2012) | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-04-26 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2012) | |
2012-04-04 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-03-30 | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2012) | |
2012-03-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7542.pdf |