RI H7541 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2022)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2022)
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of firefighting foam containing PFAS chemicals during training exercises and would prohibit firefighter turnout gear containing PFAS chemicals.
Title
Pfas Chemicals
Sponsors
Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7541.pdf |