RI H7541 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Dyslexia Diagnosis And Treatment (would Enact The Ri Dyslexia Act To Establish Policies And Treatment For Students With Dyslexia In Rhode Island Schools.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Dyslexia Diagnosis And Treatment (would Enact The Ri Dyslexia Act To Establish Policies And Treatment For Students With Dyslexia In Rhode Island Schools.)
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Baldelli-Hunt [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7541.pdf |