RI H7535 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that an open and obvious danger or defect is not a complete bar to recovery of damages in personal injury or property damage actions.
Title
Procedure Generally
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7535.pdf |