RI H7534 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provisions of the general laws allowing deferred deposit providers, also known as "payday lenders."
Title
Licensed Activities -- Lenders And Loan Brokers -- Check Cashing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7534.pdf |