RI H7522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the secretary of state to notify the appropriate elected official of a newly registered voter's most recent former place of residence, only if it is located outside of Rhode Island.
Title
Voter Registration
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-05-30 | House | House read and passed |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018) |
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |