RI H7517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the administrator of the supreme court as an individual authorized to perform marriages and would clarify that the current administrators of the superior court, family court, district court, or traffic tribunal are empowered to perform marriages.
Title
Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7517.pdf |