RI H7512 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- PUPIL TRANSPORTATION VEHICLES - "Pupil Transportation Vehicle" to be and constructed to seat not more than ten (10) passengers including the operator, rather than the existing limit of eight (8) passengers.
Title
"Pupil Transportation Vehicle" to be and constructed to seat not more than ten (10) passengers including the operator, rather than the existing limit of eight (8) passengers.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Committee on Education: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Committee on Education: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2024-03-19 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |