RI H7512 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Delete the option of straight party voting by means of a single mark in non-primary elections
Title
Conduct Of Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7512.pdf |