RI H7506 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the practice of lane splitting by motorcycles.
Title
Passing, Use Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. David Place [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7506.pdf |