RI H7472 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/29/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/29/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- AUTOMATED SCHOOL-ZONE-SPEED-ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM ACT OF 2016 - Amends the provision relative to the measurements for signs identifying school zone areas with speed enforcement systems.
Title
Amends the provision relative to the measurements for signs identifying school zone areas with speed enforcement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/29/2024) |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Motor And Other Vehicles
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- AUTOMATED SCHOOL-ZONE-SPEED-ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM ACT OF 2016
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- AUTOMATED SCHOOL-ZONE-SPEED-ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM ACT OF 2016
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7472.pdf |