RI H7462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- ENERGY FACILITY SITING ACT - Increases the membership of the energy facility siting board from 3 to 5 members and would revise the process of energy facility siting to mandate inclusion/participation of the host community of the facility as well as of the public and cities and towns.
Title
Increases the membership of the energy facility siting board from 3 to 5 members and would revise the process of energy facility siting to mandate inclusion/participation of the host community of the facility as well as of the public and cities and towns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7462.pdf |