RI H7460 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain statements by a health care provider to a patient or the patient’s family would be inadmissible as evidence or an admission of liability.
Title
Procedure Generally - Evidence
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7460.pdf |