RI H7452 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the dissemination of any indecent image of another person without authorization for the purpose of harassing, intimidating, threatening another person.
Title
Electronic Imaging Devices
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-04-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |