RI H7452 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add the secretary of state to the board of elections as a nonvoting ex officio member. It would require board of canvassers to clearly mark the 50' buffer at each polling place where political campaigning is prohibited
Title
Relating To Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7452.pdf |