RI H7446 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers - Public Utilities Commission (would Establish The Emergency Communication And Public Telecommunication Access Fund To Create An Emergency Communication Program For The Deaf And Hard-of-hearing)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers - Public Utilities Commission (would Establish The Emergency Communication And Public Telecommunication Access Fund To Create An Emergency Communication Program For The Deaf And Hard-of-hearing)
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2012) | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7446.pdf |